IL HB3550 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-4)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0579
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-4)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0579
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With regard to a sex education course, provides that course material and instruction in grades 6 through 12 must include an age-appropriate discussion on the meaning of consent that includes discussion on recognizing that (i) consent is a freely given agreement to sexual activity, (ii) consent to one particular sexual activity does not constitute consent to other types of sexual activities, (iii) a person's lack of verbal or physical resistance or submission resulting from the use or threat of force does not constitute consent, (iv) a person's manner of dress does not constitute consent, (v) a person's consent to past sexual activity does not constitute consent to future sexual activity, (vi) a person's consent to engage in sexual activity with one person does not constitute consent to engage in sexual activity with another person, (vii) a person can withdraw consent at any time, and (viii) a person cannot consent to sexual activity if that person is unable to understand the nature of the activity or give knowing consent due to certain circumstances. Removes a provision requiring material and instruction to include, with an emphasis on workplace environment and life on a college campus, discussion on what constitutes sexual consent. Makes other changes concerning the course material and instruction.
Title
SCH CD-SEX EDUCATION-CONSENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0579 |
2019-08-26 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-006-000 |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-003-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-02-20 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-02-20 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-9.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |