IL HB3527 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Provides that if the court determines that the obligor is concealing his or her income or assets for the purpose of lowering child support payments, then the court shall enter an order for parenthood cost sharing. Provides that a parenthood cost sharing order shall require the obligor to pay 50% of the yearly statewide average of basic necessity, healthcare, and child care or after school program costs of a child, prorated according to countywide economic data. Provides that any late payments are subject to a compounded 1% monthly interest rate. Effective January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IMDMA-PARENTHOOD COST SHARING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-06HouseTo Family Law Subcommittee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7505505Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback