IL HB3496 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Accident and Health Article of the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, an insurer shall allow a covered individual to purchase a health plan offered pursuant to the medical assistance program under the Illinois Public Aid Code.
Title
INS-OPTION FOR MEDICAID PLAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-26 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 31, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 27, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-05-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | House | To Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3496&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3496.htm |