IL HB3484 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Includes an allowance from the other party for a retainer fee to obtain an attorney in the definitions of "interim attorney's fees and costs" and "interim award". Provides that a petition for interim fees that seeks an order for the payment of an initial retainer to retain an attorney shall have attached to it an affidavit from the attorney to be retained that the attorney has been contacted by the moving party and the attorney has agreed to enter an appearance if the court grants the relief requested, together with a certificate from the moving party that the interim fees granted will only be used by the moving party to retain the attorney. Requires any interim fees granted to be paid directly to the identified attorney.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IMDMA-TEMPORARY RELIEF

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2021-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2021-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2021-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 117-000-000
2021-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2021-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
2021-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2021-05-29HouseArrived in House
2021-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2021-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Crowe
2021-05-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000
2021-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2021-05-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2021-05-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-05-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021
2021-05-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021
2021-05-19SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000
2021-05-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-05-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-05-10SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2021-04-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-28SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021
2021-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-22HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000
2021-04-21HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-15HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-15HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-03-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis
2021-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2021-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2021-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2021-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2021-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2021-03-23HouseDo Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2021-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7505501Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3484&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3484.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3484eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3484enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3484ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3484sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3484sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200HB3484_04222021_108071.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200HB3484_04222021_108071T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200HB3484_05292021_011071.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200HB3484sam002_05312021_047000C.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback