IL HB3473 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act and the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Expands the definition of "neglected child" under both Acts to include a child whose umbilical cord tissue contains any amount of a controlled substance as defined in a specified provision of the Illinois Controlled Substances Act or a metabolite thereof. Provides that nothing in the new provisions is intended to limit the type of medically reliable testing that can establish that a controlled substance or metabolite thereof is present in a newborn infant. Further amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987 by providing that proof that a newborn infant's umbilical cord tissue contains any amount of a controlled substance as defined under the Illinois Controlled Substances Act, or a metabolite of a controlled substance, constitutes prima facie evidence of abuse or neglect. Amends the Adoption Act. Includes as a ground of unfitness under the definition of "unfit person" a finding that at birth the child's umbilical cord tissue contained any amount of a controlled substance as defined under the Illinois Controlled Substances Act or a metabolite thereof. Provides that nothing in the new provision is intended to limit the type of medically reliable testing that can establish that a controlled substance or metabolite thereof is present in a newborn infant. Effective immediately.
Title
ABUSE-UMBILICAL CORD TISSUE
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Breen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 2-18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 2-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 50 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3473&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3473.htm |