IL HB3458 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. In provisions concerning the Director of Retail Market Development's annual report to the Illinois Commerce Commission, provides that on or before July 31, 2022 and each year thereafter, if the report includes comparisons of the prices between electric utilities and alternative retail electric suppliers, the comparisons shall include an analysis estimating the combined value of additional products and services offered by the alternative retail electric suppliers, as reported by the alternative retail electric suppliers. Provides that the Commission may include additional energy savings and marketing savings programs as they develop in the competitive retail electric market. Provides that the Commission may request information about specific products or services on a confidential and proprietary basis from alternative retail electric suppliers for the purposes of the report.
Title
UTILITIES-PRICE COMPARISON
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Burke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | To Utilities Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 20-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3458&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3458.htm |