IL HB3394 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. In provisions concerning abuse and neglect investigations involving a school employee, provides that if the Child Protective Service Unit has not conducted an investigation involving an allegation against a teacher or school employee within 3 weeks of the initial report to the Department of Children and Family Services, the school administrator, upon notification of the investigation by the Unit, may either place the teacher or employee on paid administrative leave or separate the teacher or employee from the alleged victim so that there shall be no contact between the 2 individuals during the course of the investigation. Provides that if the investigation is not completed within 3 weeks after notification to the school administrator, the administrator may, in his or her sole discretion, return the teacher or employee who is under investigation to his or her assigned position and assignments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ABUSED KIDS-SCHOOL EMPLOYEE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Human Services; 007-000-000
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-06SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 5, 2017
2017-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 008-001-000
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; by Voice Vote
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32557.4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback