IL HB3393 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-13 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-13 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that the amendatory Act may be known as the COVID-19 Pandemic Hospitality Recovery Act. Provides that payment by credit card during the period during which merchandising credit may be extended shall be considered payment. Provides that a retailer may use a credit card to make purchases from a distributor, and the distributor may charge to the retailer any fees associated with that credit card transaction. Provides that manufacturers, non-resident dealers, foreign importers, distributors, or importing distributors may donate money or COVID-19-related improvements, fixtures, and equipment to an entity exempt from federal income taxes under Section 501 of the Internal Revenue Code with the intent that eligible restaurants or retail licensees will apply for and acquire these COVID-19-related improvements, fixtures, and equipment for their use in their operations during the current COVID-19 pandemic until December 31, 2021. Provides that retail license holders may accept temporary donations, pursuant to certain restrictions, of COVID-19-related improvements, fixtures, and equipment from an entity exempt from federal income taxes under Section 501 of the Internal Revenue Code donated to the entity by Illinois licensed manufacturers, non-resident dealers, foreign importers, distributors, or importing distributors. Authorizes the delivery and carry out of a single serving of wine if specified conditions are met. Provides that the provision concerning delivery and carry out of mixed drinks is repealed on January 1, 2024 (instead of June 2, 2021). Makes other changes. Amends the Use Tax Act and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that, with respect to certain eating and drinking establishments, the obligation to make quarter monthly payments shall be suspended, and the taxpayer shall, instead, make monthly payments as otherwise provided by law. Effective immediately.
Title
CON FRAUD UNSOLICITED CHECKS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2021-01-12 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-12 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-01-12 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-12 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-01-12 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-01-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 3 |
2021-01-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Feigenholtz |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Feigenholtz |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 11, 2021 |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 10, 2021 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - Financial Institutions |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 12, 2019 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Financial Institutions Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |