IL HB3386 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Gasoline Storage Act. Provides that the State Fire Marshal shall allow residential refueling services by watercraft that are approved by the State Fire Marshal to provide fuel and that meet all applicable fire safety standards.
Title
GASOLINE STORAGE-REFUELING
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Weber [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-001-000 |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Weber |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3386&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3386.htm |