IL HB3328 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Police Training Act. Repeals language providing that mandatory training required for police chiefs and deputy police chiefs is not applicable to the City of Chicago or the Sheriff's Police Department in Cook County. Effective immediately.
Title
POLICE CHIEF TRAINING-CHICAGO
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-000 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-05 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Police & First Responders Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Police & First Responders Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 705 | 10.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |