IL HB3288 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-20)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-20)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Removes a list of specified persons who are required to immediately report suspected cases of child abuse or neglect to the Department of Children and Family Services and instead provides that any person, agency, organization, or entity that knows or in good faith suspects a child may be an abused child or a neglected child shall immediately report or cause a report to be made to the Department. Removes a requirement that a person who enters into employment on and after July 1, 1986 and is mandated by virtue of that employment to report under the Act to sign a statement on a form prescribed by the Department that the employee has knowledge and understanding of the reporting requirements of the Act. Removes a provision requiring the Department to provide such employees with copies of the Act upon request. Removes a provision requiring any other person who has reasonable cause to believe that a child has died as a result of abuse or neglect to report his or her suspicion to the appropriate medical examiner or coroner. Makes other changes.
Title
DCFS-ABUSED KIDS-REPORTERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-03-29 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-03-23 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2017-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2017-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 5 | 4.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 5 | 4.4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 5 | 7.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |