IL HB3263 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a participating municipality or instrumentality shall post on its publicly available website, if the participating municipality or instrumentality maintains a publicly available website: (1) all documents pertaining to the municipality's or instrumentality's adoption of a resolution to participate in the Fund if the municipality or instrumentality has adopted such a resolution; (2) all documents pertaining to the municipality's or instrumentality's annual projected future contributions to the Fund; and (3) information about the amount of the municipality's or instrumentality's past required contributions to the Fund for each year of participation. Provides that the public posting requirement does not require a participating municipality or instrumentality to post on its website information that is not subject to disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement by the State. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-IMRF-PUBLIC INFORMATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-01HousePassed Both Houses
2019-06-01HouseHouse Concurs
2019-06-01HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 110-001-000
2019-05-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 007-000-000
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2019-05-22HouseArrived in House
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2019-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2019-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Curran
2019-05-22SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Government Accountability and Pensions; 010-000-000
2019-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Government Accountability and Pensions
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Government Accountability and Pensions
2019-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Accountability and Pensions
2019-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass Government Accountability and Pensions; 008-000-000
2019-05-01SenatePostponed - Government Accountability and Pensions
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Government Accountability and Pensions
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019
2019-04-03SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-002
2019-04-02HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-000-000
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.43New CodeSee Bill Text
4057-135.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3263&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3263.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3263eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3263enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3263ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3263sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3263sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB3263_04032019_008000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB3263_05222019_008000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB3263sam002_06012019_034000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback