IL HB3260 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-21 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-21 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Humane Care for Animals Act and the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that no person shall lead or tether a companion animal from a moving motor vehicle or any device attached thereto.
Title
LEADING ANIMAL FROM VEHICLE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-21 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-16 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; |
2021-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-004-000 |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-03-23 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
510 | 70 | 7.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 11-1433 | New Code | See Bill Text |