IL HB3214 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Finance Act. Authorizes transfers from the designated funds into the Commitment to Human Services Fund for the sole purpose of providing funding for domestic violence programs funded by the Department of Human Services through the end of fiscal year 2017. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FINANCE-FUND TRANSFERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301058.52New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback