IL HB3210 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for tax year 2013 and thereafter, any taxing district, upon a majority vote of its governing authority, may order the county clerk to abate any portion of its taxes on commercial property on which a family-owned business is located. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-ABATE FAMILY BUSINESS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3210&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB3210.htm |