IL HB3205 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Taxpayer's Fiscal Charter Act. Provides for a discretionary spending freeze for fiscal years 2018 and 2019. Sets forth requirements to increase discretionary spending beginning in fiscal year 2020. Requires any new spending proposed by the General Assembly in addition to existing obligations shall be accompanied by a proposed source of revenue to pay for the proposed spending or specified cuts necessary to offset the proposed spending. Prohibits unfunded mandates. Requires the publishing of certain information before voting on or enacting an appropriations bill. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TAXPAYER FISCAL CHARTER ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback