IL HB3205 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Taxpayer's Fiscal Charter Act. Provides for a discretionary spending freeze for fiscal years 2018 and 2019. Sets forth requirements to increase discretionary spending beginning in fiscal year 2020. Requires any new spending proposed by the General Assembly in addition to existing obligations to be accompanied by a proposed source of revenue to pay for the proposed spending or specified cuts necessary to offset the proposed spending. Prohibits unfunded mandates. Requires the publishing of certain information before voting on or enacting an appropriations bill. Effective immediately.
Title
TAXPAYER FISCAL CHARTER ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3205&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3205.htm |