IL HB3169 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0159
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act by defining "youth in care" as persons placed in the temporary custody or guardianship of the Department of Children and Family Services pursuant to the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Amends various Acts by changing certain references to children who are wards of the Department of Children and Family Services or wards of the State to references to youth in care. Also changes terminology relating to children in the guardianship or custody of the Department of Children and Family Services. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-YOUTH IN CARE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0159
2017-08-18HouseEffective Date August 18, 2017
2017-08-18HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-25HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Human Services; 007-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-16SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-03-16SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Nick Sauer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105514-8.02aAmended CodeCitation Text
20170569Amended CodeCitation Text
2055-535Amended CodeCitation Text
2056.15Amended CodeCitation Text
2050534.11Amended CodeCitation Text
2050535.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2050539.3Amended CodeCitation Text
205054dNew CodeSee Bill Text
205055Amended CodeCitation Text
205055aAmended CodeCitation Text
205056bAmended CodeCitation Text
205057.5Amended CodeCitation Text
2051520Amended CodeCitation Text
2053510Amended CodeCitation Text
225102.01bNew CodeSee Bill Text
225102.31Amended CodeCitation Text
225107.3Amended CodeCitation Text
3010516Amended CodeCitation Text
3010524.5Amended CodeCitation Text
3252012Amended CodeCitation Text
325251Amended CodeCitation Text
3255810Amended CodeCitation Text
40553-503Amended CodeCitation Text
517910Amended CodeCitation Text
53501Amended CodeCitation Text
5553-3013Amended CodeCitation Text
7054052-10Amended CodeCitation Text
7054053-12Amended CodeCitation Text
7054053-21Amended CodeCitation Text
7054053-24Amended CodeCitation Text
7054054-18Amended CodeCitation Text
7054054-21Amended CodeCitation Text
7054054-9Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-615Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-715Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-5-10Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-6-3Amended CodeCitation Text
73055-6-3.1Amended CodeCitation Text
7401109Amended CodeCitation Text
750501Amended CodeCitation Text
7505012.2Amended CodeCitation Text
7505018.3Amended CodeCitation Text
7505018.9Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback