IL HB3138 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Real Estate License Act of 2000. Creates an education provider license to provide courses in pre-license, post-license, and continuing education subjects related to real estate transactions. Establishes requirements for an education provider license. Makes conforming changes throughout the Act. Creates an education provider instructor license and makes conforming changes throughout the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
REAL ESTATE-EDUC PROVIDERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | To Business Licenses Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 454 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 30-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 30-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 30-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 30-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 30-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 5-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 5-70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | 5-80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 454 | Art. 30 heading | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3138&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3138.htm |