IL HB3131 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Subject to appropriation, requires the State Board of Education to create a pilot program in which public elementary schools with 30% or greater mobility rates, as calculated by the State Board, may apply for and be awarded an annual grant to use the Direct Instruction teaching method. Defines "Direct Instruction" as the Direct Instructional System for Teaching Arithmetic and Reading (DISTAR) created in 1977 with a grant from the U.S. Office of Education. Sets forth reporting provisions.
Title
SCH CD-DIRECT INSTRUCTION PROG
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Esther Golar |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3131&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB3131.htm |