IL HB3124 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0759
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0759
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Removes language exempting a law enforcement agency having jurisdiction solely over a municipality with a population over 1,000,000 from the requirement to maintain a tow rotation list.
Title
ICC-TOWING DATABASE
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Sen. Lakesia Collins [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Janet Yang Rohr [D] |
Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0759 |
2022-05-13 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 018-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-002 |
2022-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 012-000-000 |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 18a-300.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 18c-1204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 18d-137 | New Code | See Bill Text |