IL HB3123 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-6)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Build Illinois Homes Tax Credit Act. Provides that owners of qualified low-income housing developments are eligible for credits against (i) State income taxes and (ii) any privilege tax or retaliatory tax, penalty, fee, charge, or payment imposed under the Illinois Insurance Code. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act and the Illinois Insurance Code to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-BUILD ILLINOIS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2021-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 409 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 444 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 232 | New Code | See Bill Text |