IL HB3119 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act and the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Adds the following instances in which the Department of Children and Family Services shall be deemed a child's legally authorized representative: (i) for purposes of consenting to emergency medical treatment for the child if the treatment itself does not involve a substantial risk of harm to the child, the failure to render such treatment will likely result in death or permanent harm to the child, and there is not time to apply for a court order under the Juvenile Court Act of 1987; and (ii) for purposes of consenting to an initial health screening for the child within 24 hours after the child is taken into temporary protective custody, or to any ordinary and routine care for the child that may be necessary and appropriate.
Title
DCFS-TEMP PROTECTIVE CUSTODY
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Demmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 5 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |