IL HB3115 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-23 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-23 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill, but with the following changes: Provides that the purpose of the Act is to assist individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities or similar conditions resulting in a most significant disability (rather than individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities and complex needs). Provides that the Customized Employment Pilot Program shall be implemented through an individualized plan for employment developed by the individual with a disability and the vocational rehabilitation counselor employed by the Division of Rehabilitation Services. Provides that the individual with a disability may choose to have a personal representative participate in the development of the individualized plan for employment. Includes the State Rehabilitation Council in the list of entities from which the Department of Human Services is required to seek advice and recommendations concerning the creation, operation, and administration of the Customized Employment Pilot Program.
Title
CUSTOMIZED EMPLOYMENT ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-001-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 017-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |