IL HB3106 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Compensation Review Act. Prohibits cost-of-living adjustments for or during the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2013, and for each fiscal year thereafter for State government legislative and executive elected officers and appointees in positions for which the Compensation Review Board previously recommended or determined compensation. Effective immediately.
Title
GA MEMBER COMPENSATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 120 | 5.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 120 | 5.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 120 | 6.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3106&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB3106.htm |