IL HB3100 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0604
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0604
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Requires mandated reporters to complete an initial implicit bias training within 3 months of their date of engagement in a professional or official capacity as a mandated reporter, with certain exceptions, and at least every 3 years thereafter. Provides that the implicit bias trainings shall be in-person or web-based and shall include, at a minimum, information on implicit bias and racial and ethnic sensitivity. Requires the implicit bias trainings to provide tools to adjust automatic patterns of thinking and ultimately eliminate discriminatory behaviors. Provides that, during these trainings, mandated reporters shall complete a pretest to assess baseline implicit bias levels, an implicit bias training task, and a posttest to reevaluate bias levels after training. Provides that the implicit bias curriculum for mandated reporters shall be developed within one year after the effective date of the amendatory Act and shall be created in consultation with organizations demonstrating expertise and or experience in the areas of implicit bias, youth and adolescent developmental issues, prevention of child abuse, exploitation, and neglect, culturally diverse family systems, and the child welfare system. Provides that implicit bias training shall be provided through the Department of Children and Family Services, through authorized entities.
Title
ANCRA-IMPLICIT BIAS TRAINING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 77 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0604 |
2021-08-27 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 077-036-000 |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-017-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 27, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 26, 2021 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 005-002-000 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-031-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2021-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |