IL HB3096 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-27 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-27 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Oil and Gas Wells on Public Lands Act. Provides that on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act, no new permits shall be issued for surface extraction activities on lands owned by the Department of Natural Resources or the federal government. Prohibits the Department of Natural Resources from entering into contracts in writing designating any person as the permittee of the State of Illinois with the exclusive right to prospect and explore public lands of the State of Illinois for the occurrence of petroleum. Repeals provisions governing certain petroleum leases, right of way over public lands, and preferential rights to prospecting permits. Effective immediately.
Title
OIL & GAS-PERMIT MORATORIUM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2015-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 615 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 17 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 18 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 21 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3096&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3096.htm |