IL HB3075 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Program Act and the Cannabis Regulation and Tax Act. Provides that agent applicants may begin employment at a cultivation center, a dispensing organization, a Community College Cannabis Vocational Training Pilot Program, an infuser organization, or a transporting organization while the agent applicant's identification card application is pending. Provides that, upon approval, the approving State entity shall issue the agent's identification card to the agent. Provides that, if denied, the cultivation center, dispensing organization, Community College Cannabis Vocational Training Pilot Program, infuser organization, or transporting organization and the agent applicant shall be notified and the agent applicant must cease all activity at the cultivation center, dispensing organization, Community College Cannabis Vocational Training Pilot Program, infuser organization, or transporting organization immediately.
Title
CANNABIS-AGENT EMPLOYMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 130 | 100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 705 | 15-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 705 | 25-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 705 | 35-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 705 | 40-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3075&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3075.htm |