IL HB3067 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0269
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0269
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. In a provision that requires contracts to be awarded to the lowest responsible bidder, removes the exception for contracts for materials and work that have been awarded to the lowest responsible bidder but must be revised, causing expenditures not in excess of 10% of the contract price. Adds an exception for contracts for the purchase of perishable foods and perishable beverages.
Title
COM COL-CONTRACT BID-EXCEPTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0269 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2013 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 089-022-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000 |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Bost |
2013-03-07 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Bost |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 805 | 3-27.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |