IL HB3049 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Law of the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that an Association must submit a plan of operation to the Director of Insurance within 200 days.
Title
INS CODE-GUARANTY ASSOCIATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | To Special Subcommittee (INS) |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 531.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3049&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3049.htm |