IL HB3049 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Hotel Operators' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that a corporate entity that occupies a room shall not be considered a "permanent resident" unless the same person or persons occupying the room have exclusive use of the room for at least 90 consecutive days. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HOTEL TX-CORPORATE ROOM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-008-000
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-23HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2017-03-23HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
2017-03-09HouseTo Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351452Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback