IL HB3047 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Reproductive Health Act. Creates the Illinois Abortion Law of 2021 containing the provisions of the Illinois Abortion Law of 1975 before its repeal by Public Act 101-13, as well as provisions defining "viability" to include when, in the medical judgment of the attending physician based on the particular facts of the case before the attending physician, there is a reasonable likelihood of sustained survival of the fetus outside the womb, with or without artificial support or the unborn child has a fetal heartbeat, and defining "fetal heartbeat" as the cardiac activity or the steady and repetitive rhythmic contraction of the fetal heart within the gestational sac. Creates the Partial-birth Abortion Ban Act of 2021 and the Abortion Performance Refusal Act of 2021 containing the provisions of the Partial-birth Abortion Ban Act and the Abortion Performance Refusal Act before their repeal by Public Act 101-13. Amends various Acts by restoring the language that existed before the amendment of those Acts by Public Act 101-13. Effective immediately.
Title
REPEAL REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Niemerg |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3047&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3047.htm |