IL HB3042 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Energy and Environmental Security Act. Amends the Energy Conservation and Coal Development Act. Creates a Qualified Clean Coal Technology Grant Program for the purpose of funding grants that will allow the grant recipient to (i) meet the qualifications of a qualified clean coal facility, (ii) operate the electric generating unit as a qualified clean coal facility while complying with State and federal emissions requirements, and (iii) mitigate the environmental impacts of the operation of coal-fueled electric generation units. Creates the Clean Coal Development and Utilization Fund to provide funding for grants. Amends the State Finance Act to make a conforming change. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UTILITIES-COAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Energy Committee; 011-003-000
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Energy Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2011051Amended CodeCitation Text
20110517New CodeSee Bill Text
20110520New CodeSee Bill Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback