IL HB3042 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Energy and Environmental Security Act. Amends the Energy Conservation and Coal Development Act. Creates a Qualified Clean Coal Technology Grant Program for the purpose of funding grants that will allow the grant recipient to (i) meet the qualifications of a qualified clean coal facility, (ii) operate the electric generating unit as a qualified clean coal facility while complying with State and federal emissions requirements, and (iii) mitigate the environmental impacts of the operation of coal-fueled electric generation units. Creates the Clean Coal Development and Utilization Fund to provide funding for grants. Amends the State Finance Act to make a conforming change. Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITIES-COAL
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] |
Rep. John Cavaletto [R] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] | Rep. Christopher Davidsmeyer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy Committee; 011-003-000 |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Energy Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1105 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1105 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1105 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.878 | New Code | See Bill Text |