IL HB3036 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0271
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0271
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that on or before January 1, 2019, a county shall adopt and implement a predictable fee schedule that eliminates surcharges or fees based upon the individual attributes of documents to be recorded with the county recorder. Provides that fees for standard documents are divided into 5 classifications of document class flat fees, which are inclusive of county and State fees required for each recorded document. Provides for methods that the non-predictable fees may be increased prior to adopting document class flat fees. Provides that prior to increasing a document class flat fee, a cost study must be completed showing that the increase is needed because the document class flat fees are not sufficient to cover the cost of providing the service. Defines "standard document" and "nonstandard document". Effective immediately.
Title
COUNTY RECORDER-FEE SCHEDULES
Sponsors
Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] | Rep. Brad Halbrook [R] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Sen. John Mulroe [D] |
Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 81 N: 32 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 81 N: 32 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0271 |
2017-08-22 | House | Effective Date August 22, 2017 |
2017-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-001 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 006-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 081-032-000 |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 3-5018 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-5018.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |