IL HB3012 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit in an amount equal to the contributions made by the taxpayer to the Illinois Education Excellence Fund during the taxable year. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Illinois Education Excellence Fund. Provides that moneys in the Fund shall be used for public education purposes. Amends the Counties Code. Provides that the county board may establish a fund in the county treasury to accept contributions for public purposes. Provides that the county may provide for a credit against the taxpayer's property tax liability in an amount equal to the amount of the contribution. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-CHARITABLE CONTRIBUTION
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. David McSweeney [R] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] |
Rep. Bob Morgan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 229 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3012&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3012.htm |