IL HB2990 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the conditions of every parole and mandatory supervised release are that the subject not knowingly frequent places where controlled substances are illegally sold, used, distributed, or administered and not knowingly associate with other persons on parole or mandatory supervised release without prior written permission of his or her parole agent, and not associate with persons who are members of an organized gang as that term is defined in the Illinois Streetgang Terrorism Omnibus Prevention Act, except when the association involves activities related to community programs, worship, services, volunteering, engaging families, or some other pro-social activity in which there is no evidence of criminal intent. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CD CORR-MSR-ASSOCIATIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-23HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-23HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-03-23HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-03-23HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73053-3-7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback