IL HB2908 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In provisions concerning medical assistance for the treatment of alcohol dependence or opioid dependence, provides that on or after July 1, 2017 such coverage may be subject to utilization controls or prior authorization mandates consistent with the most current edition of the American Society of Addiction Medicine's National Practice Guideline for the Use of Medications in the Treatment of Addiction Involving Opioid Use, as now or hereafter revised, or any successor publication (rather than on or after July 1, 2015 such coverage shall not be subject to any (1) utilization control, other than those established under the American Society of Addiction Medicine patient placement criteria, (2) prior authorization mandate, or (3) lifetime restriction limit mandate). Provides that on or after July 1, 2017, opioid antagonists prescribed for the treatment of an opioid overdose may be subject to (A) utilization controls or (B) prior authorization mandates consistent with the most current edition of the American Society of Addiction Medicine's National Practice Guideline for the Use of Medications in the Treatment of Addiction Involving Opioid Use, as now or hereafter revised, or any successor publication.
Title
MEDICAID-UTILIZATION CONTROLS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | To HS Medicaid Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2908&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2908.htm |