IL HB2905 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0098
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0098
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Increases the penalty for unlawful clouding of title from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class 4 felony for a first offense, a Class 3 felony for a second offense, a Class 2 felony for a third offense, a Class 1 felony for a fourth offense, and a Class X felony for a fifth or subsequent offense.
Title
CRIM CD-CLOUDING TITLE
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] | Rep. Cynthia Soto [D] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Al Riley [D] | Rep. Esther Golar [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 73 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0098 |
2013-07-19 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-07-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-28 | House | House Concurs |
2013-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 073-044-000 |
2013-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2013-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2013-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2013-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2013 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-04-09 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-042-000 |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2013-04-08 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-14 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 005-000-000 |
2013-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Counties & Townships Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 32-13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |