IL HB2894 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the income limitation for the Senior Citizens Assessment Freeze Homestead Exemption is: (1) $55,000 in taxable years 2008 through 2016; (2) $60,000 in taxable years 2017 through 2020; and (3) $65,000 in taxable year 2021 and thereafter (currently, $55,000 for taxable year 2008 and thereafter). Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SENIOR FREEZE INCOME
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2017-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2894&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2894.htm |