IL HB2892 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that no person first elected or appointed to the General Assembly on or after November 8, 2022 shall be eligible to become a participant in the General Assembly Retirement System.
Title
PENCD-GARS-GA MEMBER ELIGIBLE
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Frese [R] | Rep. Adam Niemerg [R] | Rep. Mike Murphy [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Randy E. Frese |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2892&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2892.htm |