IL HB2855 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Video Gaming Act. Increases the maximum wager played per hand to $4 (rather than $2). Increases the maximum cash award for a wager on any individual hand to $1,199 (rather than $500). Adds a maximum cash award for the maximum wager on a jackpot, progressive or otherwise, of $10,000. Allows a licensed establishment, licensed truck stop establishment, licensed veterans establishment, or licensed fraternal establishment that operates 5 video gaming terminals and averages $175 or more per day on those terminals, to apply to the Board for permission to operate a 6th video gaming terminal. Effective immediately.
Title
GAMING-MAXIMUM BET/PAYOUT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | To Gaming Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 40 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2855&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2855.htm |