IL HB2846 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Restricts participation in the General Assembly Retirement System by members of the General Assembly to persons who become participants before January 1, 2022 and provides that, beginning on that date, the System shall not accept any new participants who are members of the General Assembly. Makes related changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-GARS-NO NEW GA MEMBERS
Sponsors
Rep. Blaine Wilhour [R] | Rep. Dan Caulkins [R] | Rep. Chris Miller [R] | Rep. Adam Niemerg [R] |
Rep. Paul Jacobs [R] | Rep. Michael Marron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 2-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 2-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2846&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2846.htm |