IL HB2810 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Humane Care for Animals Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
ANIMALS-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] | Rep. Jerry Long [R] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] |
Sen. Andy Manar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0504 |
2017-09-15 | House | Effective Date June 1, 2018 |
2017-09-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-07-26 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-06-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-06-27 | House | House Concurs |
2017-06-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000 |
2017-06-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-06-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-000-000 |
2017-06-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-06-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-016-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 007-002-000 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Re-assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
510 | 70 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |