IL HB2808 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the credit for instructional materials and supplies may not exceed $500 (currently, $250). Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-CLASSROOM CREDIT
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Rep. Jawaharial Williams [D] |
Rep. Lindsey LaPointe [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-08-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 225 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2808&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2808.htm |