IL HB2792 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that an applicant for a Firearm Owner's Identification Card must receive a psychiatric or psychological evaluation by a psychiatrist, clinical psychologist, or clinical social worker and receive a certification by the psychiatrist, clinical psychologist, or clinical social worker that he or she: (1) is not a danger to himself, herself, or to others; (2) does not lack the mental capacity to manage his or her own affairs; (3) is able to provide for his or her basic physical needs so as to guard himself or herself from serious harm without the assistance of family or others; and (4) does not have a state of mind manifested by violent, suicidal, threatening, or assaultive behavior that poses a clear and present danger to himself, herself, or to others at the time of the evaluation or in the future. Provides that if a patient of a psychiatrist, clinical psychologist, or clinical social worker has received a psychiatric or psychological evaluation and the psychiatrist, clinical psychologist, or clinical social worker determines that the Card holder is ineligible for the Card for these reasons, the psychiatrist, clinical psychologist, or clinical social worker shall immediately after making the determination shall forward that information to the Department of State Police. Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Confidentiality Act to permit disclosure of this information. Effective immediately.
Title
FIREARM OWNERS ID-PSYCH EXAM
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 110 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2792&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2792.htm |