IL HB2778 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-13 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. With respect to the daily pupil attendance calculation, provides that instead of school improvement days with students in attendance a minimum of 3 clock hours, a school district may opt to have a school improvement day without students in attendance for up to 4 times in a given school year. Provides that each such day may be counted as a day of attendance, provided that a sufficient number of clock hours have been accumulated beyond the 5 clock hours per day that students would have been in session. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-DAILY PUPIL ATTENDANCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-13SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021
2021-10-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading October 19, 2021
2021-10-13SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2021-05-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-05-29SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-05-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2021-05-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-05-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2021-05-25SenatePostponed - Education
2021-05-21SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021
2021-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2021-05-19SenatePostponed - Education
2021-05-12SenatePostponed - Education
2021-05-04SenateAssigned to Education
2021-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-22HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000
2021-04-21HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-15HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-15HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva Dina Delgado
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2021-03-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-03-17HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-19HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-19.05Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback