IL HB2774 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Right to Know Act. Provides that an operator of a commercial website or online service that collects personally identifiable information through the internet about individual customers residing in Illinois who use or visit its commercial website or online service shall notify those customers of certain specified information pertaining to its personal information sharing practices. Requires an operator to make available certain specified information upon disclosing a customer's personal information to a third party, and to provide an e-mail address or toll-free telephone number whereby customers may request or obtain that information. Provides for a right of action to customers whose rights are violated under the Act. Provides that any waiver of the provisions of the Act or any agreement that does not comply with the applicable provisions of the Act shall be void and unenforceable. Provides that no provision of the Act shall be construed to conflict with or apply to certain specified provisions of federal law or certain interactions with State or local government. Provides findings and purpose. Defines terms.
Title
RIGHT TO KNOW ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 7 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 7 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 006-004-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 006-004-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |