IL HB2774 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
SAFETY-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Smiddy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Smiddy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |