IL HB2755 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Passed on July 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Passed on July 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the MC/DD Act. Provides that long-term care for under age 22 facilities shall be licensed as medically complex for the developmentally disabled facilities under the MC/DD Act instead of the ID/DD Community Care Act. Makes the provisions in the MC/DD Act substantially the same as those in the ID/DD Community Care Act, including provisions for the rights of residents and responsibilities of facilities, licensing, violations and penalties, and transfer or discharge of residents. Amends various Acts to make conforming changes. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Contains a nonacceleration provision. Effective July 1, 2015.
Title
MEDICALLY COMPLEX DD FACILITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-29 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0180 |
2015-07-29 | House | Effective Date July 29, 2015 |
2015-07-29 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 112-000-000 |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-05-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Esther Golar |
2015-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 005-000-000 |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2015-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2015-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Special Needs Services; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2015-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Special Needs Services |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Esther Golar |